Accounts and annual returns STREETWISE 2000

Charity number: 1157194
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 23 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 23 January 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 09 October 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 07 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 07 December 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 02 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 02 December 2015 On Time