Financial history GEORGE GOETCHIUS & DONALD HOWARTH SOCIETY OF FRIENDS AWARDS

Charity number: 1154004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £31 £3.99m £103.27k £5.81k £183.53k
Total expenditure £26.97k £34.44k £19.25k £176.43k £47.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £3.99m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £3.99m N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £34.44k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A