Accounts and annual returns LEATHERHEAD YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1152537
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 11 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 11 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 06 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 06 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 27 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 27 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 18 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 10 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 10 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window