Financial history AUTISM ALL STARS FOUNDATION UK

Charity Number: 1152681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.70k £33.60k £33.10k £30.75k £27.84k
Total expenditure £28.52k £27.99k £33.39k £33.11k £31.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £3.50k N/A