Financial history HEALTHWATCH EALING

Charity number: 1153807
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £196.92k £105.68k £100 £0 £0
Total expenditure £253.95k £64.48k £12.92k £0 £0
Income from government contracts £160.30k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £105.68k N/A N/A N/A