BACKWELL LIFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle activity is The Meeting Point, a community hub in Backwell where people can meet to socialise, access a range of services & support. It hosts chair yoga, children's holiday activities and a drop-in cafe. A wide range of information and service contact details is available. There's also internet access, Foodbank vouchers, a popular bi-monthly lunch club, and occasional speakers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Somerset
Governance
- 17 December 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN CANNING | Chair | 13 November 2024 |
|
|||||||
Susan Watts | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
SARAH PAYNE | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
TAMSIN HOCKETT | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||
DOUGLAS NEILSON | Trustee | 12 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.96k | £2.83k | £9.26k | £6.61k | £6.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.09k | £2.48k | £6.60k | £8.19k | £6.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £250 | £400 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £500 | £500 | £1.10k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 17 Dec 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO FURTHER THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF BACKWELL, N SOMERSET AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS AND SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 WEST TOWN ROAD
BACKWELL
BRISTOL
BS48 3HA
- Phone:
- 01275790309
- Email:
- backwell.life@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window