LONG EATON AND SAWLEY FOODBANK

Charity number: 1152886
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

RUNNING A FOODBANK

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £83,798
Total expenditure: £65,314

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire
  • Leicestershire
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 July 2013: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Mary Scott Chair 22 February 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LONG EATON SAINT JOHN'S
Recently registered
Jaspal Kaur Trustee 27 February 2025
None on record
Lindsey Rowlinson Trustee 23 January 2025
None on record
Rev Anne Louise Wilkins Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
Rev Michael Arnold Trustee 11 November 2021
None on record
Rona Gidlow Trustee 23 April 2020
None on record
GODFREY GEORGE GRAVER Trustee 23 November 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.66k £95.60k £33.24k £81.42k £83.80k
Total expenditure £18.53k £41.84k £19.67k £24.25k £65.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.80k £125 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 June 2024 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 10 June 2024 131 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 February 2023 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 February 2023 25 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
165 Wilmot Street
Long Eaton
NOTTINGHAM
NG10 3EL
Phone:
0795 054 7671