LGBT OUT IN THE BAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY LGBT OUT IN THE BAY (LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANS GENDER) (A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
Total income includes £28,872 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
Governance
- LGBT OITB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maria Hryniw | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liam Sean Carroll | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jolanta Cross | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hardeep Kang | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen James | Trustee | 29 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.82k | £92.82k | £152.67k | £165.51k | £196.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.95k | £89.51k | £154.91k | £161.65k | £200.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.00k | £35.00k | N/A | £20.00k | £28.87k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Jul 2013 as amended on 09 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
The promotion of equality and diversity for the public benefit by LGBT out in the bay (lesbian, gay, bisexual and trans gender); (a) the elimination of discrimination on the grounds of race, gender, disability, sexual orientation or religion; (b) advancing education and raising awareness in equality and diversity; (c) promoting activities to foster understanding between people from diverse backgrounds (d) conducting or commissioning research on equality and diversity issues and publishing the results to the public; (e) cultivating a sentiment in favour of equality and diversity. (f) open to anyone, in particular the LGBT community (g) within the Lancaster district although open to anyone from any area who wishes to access our service. (h) creating a safe and welcoming environment where people can explore verbally and express their sexuality or gender identity. To relieve members of the LGBT+ community who are in need as a consequence of being homeless, in particular but not exclusively people with severe and enduring mental illness, people with learning disabilities and people with other associated complexities and needs.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE LANCASTER DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Out In The Bay
30 Claremont Road
MORECAMBE
Lancashire
LA4 4HL
- Phone:
- 07474163458
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window