THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, FROGMORE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC cooperates with the ministers to promote the whole mission of the church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical according to the doctrines and practices of the Church of England. We are a Christ-Proclaiming, Bible-centred Church offering a warm welcome to anyone so that together we can learn of, grow in and be transformed by Jesus, and be equipped to serve Jesus in His world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 02 October 2013: Previously excepted registration
- HOLY TRINITY PCC, FROGMORE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Revd Dr Nicholas James Weir | Chair | 30 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Robert Eugene Crawley | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Cynthia Mary Gabriel | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Punter | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Jonathan David Arr | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ward | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Anne Brown | Trustee | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Jonathan Hunt | Trustee | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Edwards | Trustee | 02 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY ANN WARD | Trustee | 30 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ruth May Ward | Trustee | 30 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nigel Andrew Ward | Trustee | 30 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £248.14k | £216.60k | £217.86k | £202.90k | £268.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.71k | £295.41k | £186.81k | £227.00k | £228.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Trinity Church
Church Office
37 Frogmore
ST. ALBANS
AL2 2JU
- Phone:
- 01727873974
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window