Financial history NEW FUTURE COLLECTIVE LTD

Charity Number: 1153729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £343.01k £290.96k £295.94k £331.60k £362.43k
Total expenditure £333.44k £172.03k £314.37k £291.32k £381.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £2.70k N/A
Income from government grants £66.84k £203.45k £211.40k £96.53k £24.80k