NEW FUTURE COLLECTIVE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
New Future Collective is an arts and cultural charity which develops the creative capacities and enriches the cultural lives of residents of Hackney and beyond via a programme of creative and cultural activity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £24,800 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hackney
Governance
- 09 September 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Granville Needham | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter William Huntley | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Adu-Sarkodie | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rowan John Lindsay | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Alice March | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Thomas Pidgeon | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Wootton | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Iqbal Kabir | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £343.01k | £290.96k | £295.94k | £331.60k | £362.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £333.44k | £172.03k | £314.37k | £291.32k | £381.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.70k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £66.84k | £203.45k | £211.40k | £96.53k | £24.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/08/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ARTS AND CULTURE AND THEIR PUBLIC APPRECIATION IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN THE UK,PREDOMINANTLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY HACKNEY,TOWER HAMLETS AND SURROUNDING AREAS AND 2.1.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS AND CULTURE FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN THE UK,PREDOMINANTLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY HACKNEY,TOWER HAMLETS AND SURROUNDING AREAS AND 2.1.3 TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN THE UK,PREDOMINANTLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN HACKNEY,TOWER HAMLETS AND SURROUNDING AREAS,IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY,AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hackney Showroom
4 Murrain Road
Kings Crescent Estate
London
N4 2BN
- Phone:
- 02030959747
- Email:
- hello@hackneyshowroom.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window