SOUTHEAST REGIONAL TAMUDHEE LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities carried out during the reporting period 1. Immigration Advice program organised on 24th April 2014 2. Hall rental and providing space to celebrate different type of community festivals during the year. 3. Made donations to needy and vulnerable dependents who lost their partners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of London
- Greenwich
- Nepal
Governance
- 25 April 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HARI PRASAD GURUNG | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MR PK GURUNG | Trustee | 18 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
KESH BAHADUR GURUNG | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ash Bahadur Gurung | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|||||
SHRICHANDRA GURUNG | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|||||
HIRA PRASAD GURUNG | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
YOG PRASAD GURUNG | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
NARAIN BAHADUR GURUNG | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHANDRAMAN GURUNG | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUMAN GURUNG | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
KHARKA BAHADUR GURUNG | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.11k | £33.31k | £32.00k | £62.16k | £76.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.71k | £23.81k | £38.70k | £38.82k | £66.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 November 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 November 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 NOV 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE ORGANISATION ARE : ? TO PROMOTE CHARITY PROGRAMMES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE GURUNG FAMILIES (COMMUNITY) FOR THEIR WELFARE AND MOTIVATION. ? TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE GURKHA (NEPALESE) COMMUNITY TO SHARE THE VARIOUS CULTURAL ACTIVITIES YEAR AROUND. ? TO ORGANIZE FUND RAISING CAMPAIGN FOR THE COMMUNITY CENTRE AND ITS MAINTENANCE. ? TO PRESERVE THE RELIGIOUS BELIEF, CULTURAL HERITAGE AND IDENTITY OF GURUNGS (TAMUS). ? TO EDUCATE AND DEVELOP SKILLS FOR THE YOUTH TO MERGE INTO NATIONAL MAINSTREAM WITH THEIR OWN CULTURAL IDENTITY. ? TO ENCOURAGE AND EDUCATE PEOPLE TO PARTICIPATE IN THE EVENTS LIKE ERADICATING THE ANTI SOCIAL ELEMENTS FROM THE COMMUNITY WITH HEALTH AND SAFETY CONSCIOUSNESS. ? TO ORGANIZE SEMINARS AND CLASSES TO EDUCATE TRADITIONAL LANGUAGE, LITERATURE, CULTURE, RELIGIONS BELIEF, HEALTH AND SAFETY ISSUES FOCUSING ON YOUTHS FROM THIS COMMUNITY. ? TO CREATE AN ENVIRONMENT THAT THE FACILITIES OF THE COMMUNITY CENTRE IS BEING USED BY ALL ON EQUAL OPPORTUNITY BASIS. ? TO ESTABLISH A BRIDGE BETWEEN LOCAL COUNCIL, GOVERNMENT AND ASSOCIATION FOR LEGAL AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE ON ACQUIRING NATIONAL RESOURCES OR GRANTS FOR THE BETTERMENT OF COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 Panfield Road
Abbeywood
London
SE2 9DQ
- Phone:
- 07769775444
- Email:
- taxplatform123@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window