DEPAUL HOUSING SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitable company was formed in 2013 and became a registered social landlord in 2014. The company owns and manages accommodation services for the benefit of homeless young people within the Tyneside and Manchester areas, as well the London Borough of Haringey.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£858,000
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £858.00k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£817,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £817.00k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £817.00k | |
Retained for future use | £41.00k |
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Haringey
- Manchester City
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 18 December 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Ian Hellawell | Chair | 21 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Michael Anthony McCall | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Urvashi Bhagat | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Michael Derek Jones | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.00k | £499.00k | £113.00k | £448.00k | £858.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.00k | £66.00k | £115.00k | £432.00k | £817.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £312.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £858.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £817.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.57m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £170.00k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.15m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 JUN 2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT 1. TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE, AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL HOUSING IN ENGLAND, ANY OTHER PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH OR INCIDENTAL TO THE PROVISION AND MANAGEMENT OF SOCIAL HOUSING, SHELTER, ACCOMMODATION, TRAINING AND OTHER SERVICES TO PERSONS WHOM THE TRUSTEES SHALL DEEM TO BE IN NEED OF SUCH PROVISION BY REASON OF HOMELESSNESS, DEPRIVATION OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES (?ELIGIBLE PERSONS?), 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO ELIGIBLE PERSONS, 3. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES FOR ELIGIBLE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED, AND 4. TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND FURTHER THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS OF DEPAUL UK. 'DEPAUL UK' MEANS DEPAUL UK, A COMPANY LIMITED BY GUARANTEE REGISTERED IN ENGLAND AND WALES UNDER COMPANY NUMBER 2440093 AND REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 802384.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Depaul UK
Sherborne House
34-36 Decima Street
LONDON
SE1 4QQ
- Phone:
- 0207 939 1220
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window