ACTION FOR HUMANITY

Charity number: 1154881
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

(1) RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. (2) RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. (4) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY F

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bangladesh
  • Iraq
  • Jordan
  • Lebanon
  • Syria
  • Turkey
  • Yemen

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 September 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • SRIC LTD (Previous name)
  • SYRIA RELIEF LIMITED (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr AYMAN JUNDI Trustee 15 February 2024
None on record
Irfan Munir Trustee 15 February 2024
None on record
Abeer Zabadne Trustee 15 February 2024
None on record
Louai Al- Abed Trustee 15 February 2024
None on record
Dr MOHAMMAD ANAS NASHAWI Trustee 15 February 2024
None on record
Dr Mounir Hakimi Trustee 15 February 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £18.83m £26.68m £26.16m £30.38m £42.74m
Total expenditure £18.04m £27.63m £24.95m £29.44m £38.28m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.86m £3.46m £5.66m £2.58m £10.54m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £15.96m £23.20m £19.73m £27.80m £31.59m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £19.56k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £14.20k £0 £769.01k £5.50k £602.52k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £17.20m £26.27m £23.74m £28.30m £37.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £837.84k £1.28m £1.21m £1.14m £1.18m
Expenditure - Governance £85.98k £445.76k £329.79k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £80.75k £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £182.47k £371.74k £373.02k £725.98k £770.03k
Long-term investments £325.00k £240.00k £240.00k £0 £0
Other assets £6.39m £6.31m £7.49m £8.76m £12.72m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.56m £2.54m £2.51m £2.95m £2.49m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 18 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 08/09/2011 as amended on 12 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 3.3.1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE IN SYRIA, AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS/SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. 3.3.2 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE IN SYRIA, AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT. 3.3.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN SYRIA, AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT. 3.3.4 SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
Registration history
  • 14 September 2011 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
6 Carolina Way
Salford
Greater Manchester
M50 2ZY
Phone:
01618600163