BLACKHILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish a community centre and to promote for the benefit of the inhabitants of Blackhill, Consett the provision of facilities for education, recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have need of such facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 23 August 2013: CIO registration
- 04 October 2013: Funds received from 520759 BLACKHILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Worters B ARCH | Chair | 11 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Patricia Lesley Clark | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Newton | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Anderson | Trustee | 30 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM TURNBULL | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN FENWICK SLATER | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Toner | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Edith Parkinson | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY AMY HEDLEY | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.86k | £18.19k | £23.43k | £11.92k | £16.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.50k | £15.39k | £9.22k | £22.51k | £13.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.90k | £19.34k | £3.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 February 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 March 2024 | 124 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Aug 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO PROVIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BLACKHILL, CONSETT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT ON IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLACKHILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
DERWENT STREET
CONSETT
DH8 8LS
- Phone:
- 01207504272
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window