THE EMANUEL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The EPA provides: parenting seminars on subjects such as teenage relationships, safe internet use, avoiding drug and/or alcohol abuse, etc.; support to the school's careers department through parents' occupational/business experience and expertise; a school uniform exchange; 'meet the teachers' events; other opportunities for parents to meet and exchange views etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 15 July 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Barnes | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tamatha-Jayne Hubble | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Vickers | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Wunderlin | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Josephine McArthur | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amita Arya | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Lye Cheng Yang | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.99k | £24.42k | £30.00k | £27.22k | £76.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.56k | £22.92k | £13.00k | £17.16k | £48.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 15 Jul 2013 as amended on 13 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, INCLUDING THE PUPILS OF EMANUEL SCHOOL IN BATTERSEA ('THE SCHOOL') IN PARTICULAR, BY: 1. DEVELOPING SUPPORTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Prospect Quay
98 Point Pleasant
London
SW18 1PR
- Phone:
- 07813672008
- Email:
- info@epa.uk.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window