Financial history RAMPWORLD CARDIFF

Charity number: 1152842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £749.94k £515.00k £591.88k £539.31k £621.32k
Total expenditure £550.15k £487.52k £583.36k £524.31k £603.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £53.41k £115.91k £5.36k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £693.85k £396.09k £586.52k £539.31k £621.32k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £56.09k £118.91k £5.36k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £190.32k £177.55k £217.67k £251.01k £267.67k
Expenditure - Raising funds £185.04k £175.52k £222.08k £112.92k £180.38k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £174.79k £134.45k £143.61k £160.39k £155.30k