HUTTON HENRY & DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a village hall for the use of inhabitants of Hutton Henry without distinction of political, religious or other options.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £11,610 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
Governance
- 04 October 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Peterken | Chair | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Proctor | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Holbrook | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WATTS | Trustee | 04 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG ARMSTRONG | Trustee | 04 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
GARY SHEARS | Trustee | 04 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.39k | £12.29k | £5.99k | £4.68k | £14.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.38k | £15.85k | £2.70k | £6.00k | £13.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.30k | £3.91k | £800 | £11.61k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 May 2024 | 189 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 May 2024 | 189 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 04 Oct 2013 as amended on 27 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF HUTTON HENRY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS,INCLUDING USE FOR:(A)MEETINGS,LECTURES AND CLASSES,AND(B)OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION,WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Francis Village Hall
Front Street
Hutton Henry
Co Durham
TS27 4RY
- Phone:
- 07944633570
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window