AID BUKAVU EDUCATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activity of "Aid Bukavu Education" Charity is to advance the education of children in the Democratic Republic of Congo, province of South Kivu, Bukavu, Africa in particular, but not exclusively, for poor, orphaned, disabled and vulnerable children by the provision of education and IT training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
Governance
- 11 October 2013: Standard registration
- 12 April 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
- SBT (Working name)
- SOUVENIRS DE BUKAVU TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.21k | £1.26k | £100 | |
|
Total expenditure | £953 | £1.16k | £100 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 13 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 APR 2013 AS AMENDED ON 21/08/2013 AS AMENDED ON 06/10/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN THE REPUBLIC DEMOCRATIC OF CONGO, PROVINCE OF SOUTH KIVU, BUKAVU, AFRICA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY POOR, ORPHANED, DISABLED AND VULNERABLE CHILDREN BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND IT TRAINING
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window