STRATFORD UPON AVON FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Stratford upon Avon Foodbank are the prevention or relief of poverty in Stratford-upon-Avon and surrounding areas in particular but not exclusively by providing emergency food supplies to individuals in need and/or charities, or other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £15,320 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 08 August 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Davina Logan | Chair | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gerry Dryden | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Rolfe | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iina Jutila | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Collins | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neal Hounsell | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Turner | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Margaret Hedger | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Gerard Langley | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.48k | £230.00k | £211.34k | £191.26k | £372.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.77k | £118.15k | £167.17k | £100.68k | £309.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.05k | N/A | £18.40k | N/A | £15.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Aug 2013 as amended on 14 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN STRATFORD UPON AVON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD SUPPLIES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR OTHER CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fred Winter Centre
41 Guild Street
Stratford upon Avon
CV37 6QY
- Phone:
- 07736 929029
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window