THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, HILDERSHAM

Charity number: 1153435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote with the Priest in Charge the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, social, evangelistic and ecumenical. To maintain the church building and surrounding areas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £41,273
Total expenditure: £45,857

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 August 2013: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • HOLY TRINITY HILDERSHAM PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Iain Gordon McColl Chair 12 April 2018
THE MAJOR CHARLES HALL MEMORIAL CHARITY FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Keith Daniel Day Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
Rosalinde Mary Gray Trustee 23 September 2020
None on record
John Mervyn Wingfield Trustee 10 August 2019
THE HILDERSHAM CHURCH TRUST FOR THE RECTOR AND OTHER ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES
Received: On time
Anne-Marie Melloy Trustee 10 August 2019
THE HILDERSHAM CHURCH TRUST FOR THE RECTOR AND OTHER ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES
Received: On time
AMANDA MARY JANE PALMER Trustee 14 August 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £85.78k £45.48k £46.61k £50.36k £41.27k
Total expenditure £79.39k £51.22k £51.88k £53.79k £45.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 November 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 November 2021 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
12 Beech Row
Hildersham
Cambridge
Cambridge
CB21 6BT
Phone:
01223893039