Cornelly Development Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An integrated ?one stop? resource centre for the community of Cornelly and surrounding districts, supporting, providing and developing facilities which promote education, employment and social interaction for local residents. Managing volunteer opportunities, community events, running Job Clubs and offering training courses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bridgend
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 25 September 2014: Standard registration
- Amdani (Working name)
- CADDT (Working name)
- CORNELLY & DISTRICT DEVELOPMENT TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paisley Jones | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Swift | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annette Jean Pritchard | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Sheppard | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Craig Anthony Lambourne | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.68k | £147.68k | £128.94k | £239.93k | £159.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.14k | £99.03k | £177.81k | £272.58k | £187.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £20.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £61.41k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 March 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 March 2023 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 JUL 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/05/2014 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16/07/2014 as amended on 16 Mar 2022 as amended on 12 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT (B)THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT (C)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE (D)THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER NEED THROUGH HELP: (1) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS; OR (2) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES (E)THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS (F) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN THE CONDITIONS OF NEED AND IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING (G) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES (H) THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE ON THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND/OR THOSE WHO, BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES (I) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT (J)THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE (K)THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME (L)SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
45/47 Heol Fach
North Cornelly
Bridgend
CF33 4LN
- Phone:
- 01656670812
- Email:
- info@amdani.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window