Accounts and annual returns MAIDSTONE WIND SYMPHONY

Charity Number: 1156003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 17 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 18 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required