Governing document MAIDSTONE WIND SYMPHONY
Charity Number: 1156003

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/08/2013 AS AMENDED ON 04/02/2014 AS AMENDED ON 20/10/2015 as amended on 16 Oct 2018 as amended on 09 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF AND EDUCATION IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN SUCH A WAY AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.