SUNBEAMS PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-School from 2 year 6 months to 5 years
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Total income includes £97,625 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 05 July 2013: CIO registration
- 06 April 2016: Funds received from 1040398 SUNBEAMS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
- 26 July 2019: Funds transferred to
- 26 July 2019: Removed (Removed by application)
- SUNBEAMS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £97.78k | £128.07k | £125.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £102.14k | £114.66k | £132.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £110.96k | £97.63k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 23 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 23 June 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 16 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | 16 March 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 12 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | 11 May 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 05 Jul 2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HAVING AS ITS OBJECTS THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; (2) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; (3) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; (4) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; (5) PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; AND (6) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window