ST. CUTHBERT'S OLD SCHOOL NURSERY

Charity number: 1153838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of nursery education with a Christian ethos.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £109,892
Total expenditure: £113,497

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Stockport

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 September 2013: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Ian Luke Chidlow Chair 01 September 2023
None on record
Kate Jeanette Cookson Trustee 01 May 2025
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, CHEADLE
Received: On time
Lora Jayne Gardner Trustee 05 July 2023
None on record
Martin Richard Cheal Trustee 27 January 2023
None on record
JOANNE LOUISE DAVIDS Trustee 28 March 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, CHEADLE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £99.38k £95.91k £86.96k £104.06k £109.89k
Total expenditure £106.04k £106.04k £94.03k £100.36k £113.50k
Income from government contracts N/A £95.91k £77.11k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £90.05k N/A N/A £87.71k £90.20k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 Cuthbert Road
CHEADLE
Cheshire
SK8 2DT
Phone:
01614287682