Financial history BREAKING BARRIERS NW

Charity number: 1153249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £37.38k £51.77k £146.00k £148.75k £189.88k
Total expenditure £57.79k £54.91k £118.00k £156.91k £198.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £108.53k £146.55k
Income from government grants £17.66k £29.09k £41.00k N/A N/A