THE TOP CHARITY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is reliant on voluntary donations from members of Top Online Partners Group Limited. These donations are paid over to the charity chosen by the members. The charity has also adopted Shropshire,Staffordshire & Cheshire Blood Bikes as its main charity for a period of no less than 12 months. Various fund raising events are organised throughout this period and donations collected are paid.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 11 February 2014: Standard registration
- THE TOP CHARITY (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLIVER MURRAY RAGG | Chair | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER AMISON | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL EMILE TOMKINS | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.66k | £38.69k | £22.94k | £41.88k | £143.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.49k | £44.07k | £23.18k | £24.36k | £142.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/01/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYS OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: - THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, CHARITIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED. - THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPLY OF MEDICAL AID TO SUCH PERSONS AND/OR CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO RELIEVE THE SAME. - THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. - TO ASSIST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT ANY CHARITY REGISTERED IN ENGLAND AND WALES WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE ADVANCING EDUCATION OF PERSONS BY DEVELOPING THEIR MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND MORAL CAPABILITIES THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Top Cash Back
Temeraire House
Nelson Court
Staffordshire Technology Park
Stafford
ST18 0WQ
- Phone:
- 01785503121
- Email:
- peter@topcashback.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window