GALLIPOLI & DARDANELLES INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Remembrance, friendship and education. We attend remembrance events and organise remembrance events. We cultivate international friendship whenever possible and encourage and assist with international student exchanges. We also encourage awareness through education of the tragic effects of war and the lessons to be learnt.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Norfolk
- Australia
- France
- Germany
- New Zealand
- Turkey
Governance
- 04 September 2013: Standard registration
- GDINTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN CROWE | Chair | 19 July 2013 |
|
|||||
Ian Reed | Trustee | 25 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Guy Audibert | Trustee | 17 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hall | Trustee | 20 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Haldun Solmazturk | Trustee | 02 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.52k | £813 | £1.89k | £2.19k | £2.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.83k | £1.03k | £2.14k | £2.11k | £3.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 APR 2013 AS AMENDED ON 17/08/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, ESPECIALLY YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE LEGACY AND LESSONS OF THE GALLIPOLI CAMPAIGN, PARTICULARLY BY HONOURING AND COMMEMORATING THE CAMPAIGN, ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF EACH COUNTRY'S EXPERIENCE OF THE CAMPAIGN
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 Durban Road
Beckenham
Kent
BR3 4EZ
- Phone:
- 07956188826
- Email:
- JOHNCROWE@UWCLUB.NET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window