FAIRWAYS ACCOMMODATION SUPPORT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST HOMELESS PERSONS AND COUPLES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS. IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1)PROVIDING HOUSING FACILITIES FOR THE HOMELESS TO ASSIST THEM TO RE-INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY 2)THE PROVISION OF A DAY TIME DROP IN CENTRE 3)THE PROVISION OF AN ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT SERVICE. 4)EMBOWERING SERVICES USERS WITH LIFE SKILLS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
- Nigeria
Governance
- 13 January 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ayoola Caroline Adetuni | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Yomi Olufemi | Trustee | 28 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kim Mills | Trustee | 28 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kayode Obansa | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ADENIYI ALABA ADETUNJI | Trustee | 25 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN ADELOLA LAMBO | Trustee | 25 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £394.67k | £540.66k | £461.85k | £483.11k | £442.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £379.81k | £556.38k | £373.64k | £541.26k | £455.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £142.38k | £391.03k | £360.21k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £92.59k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £305.69k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £142.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £403.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £153.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 26 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 26 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 APR 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/01/2014
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST HOMELESS PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS. IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1)PROVIDING HOUSING FACILITIES FOR THE HOMELESS TO ASSIST THEM TO RE-INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY 2)THE PROVISION OF A DAY TIME DROP IN CENTRE 3)THE PROVISION OF AN ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT SERVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
99-101 High Street
CHATHAM
Kent
ME4 4DL
- Phone:
- 01634753170
- Email:
- info.fairwaystrust@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window