Accounts and annual returns M D C C THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 503911
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2007 25 August 2008 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not submitted