THE BRADFIELD CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Club provides for the social, educational, recreational and individual development needs of the young people of Southwark. This work is focused on the young people's club based in Peckham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Southwark
Governance
- 06 December 2013: CIO registration
- 16 June 2015: Funds received from 303201 THE LEGACY BRADFIELD CLUB IN PECKHAM
- THE BRADFIELD CLUB IN PECKHAM (Previous name)
- THE BRADFIELD CLUB IN PECKHAM1 (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Charles Sansom | Chair | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christa Simpson-Wong | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tim Cottrell | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Vildavskaya | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Robert Pirnie | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roxana Done | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
George William Stanton Masters | Trustee | 24 February 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr Christopher Stevens | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Paul Williams | Trustee | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
IAIN CAMPBELL CLARK | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136.54k | £91.75k | £107.62k | £243.57k | £243.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £162.44k | £113.64k | £106.77k | £146.02k | £146.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 06 DEC 2013 AMENDED ON 15 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATION, AND IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, RECREATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK AND/OR IN THE AREAS OF READING COUNCIL, WEST BERKSHIRE COUNCIL AND WOKINGHAM BOROUGH COUNCIL SO AS TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, SOCIAL, SPIRITUAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Bradfield Club In Peckham
5-13 Commercial Way
LONDON
SE15 6DQ
- Phone:
- 02077032692
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window