ST JOSEPH'S PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aims of the preschool are to enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups. Pre-school is open to children from the term before they turn 3 yrs old. From Sept 2014 pre-school will be accepting a limited number of children who are 2 years of age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £153,006 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Derby City
Governance
- 30 August 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha McKenna | Trustee | 20 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Parkes | Trustee | 19 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Joseph Parkes | Trustee | 19 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Hall | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.11k | £162.38k | £156.15k | £157.88k | £188.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.97k | £149.55k | £144.57k | £162.95k | £185.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £119.41k | £140.21k | N/A | £148.21k | £153.01k | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.21k | £5.32k | £134.85k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 MAR 2012 as amended on 15 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Squires Way
Littleover
Derby
DE23 3XB
- Phone:
- 01332518589
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window