SPA VIEW COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith locally, nationally and internationally through its services, meetings and activities based primarily in Hackenthorpe Sheffield and beyond. Also to relieve sickness, financial hardship, lack of education and in other related ways.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
51 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 09 August 2013: Standard registration
- 30 April 2014: Funds received from 1041890 ROTHER VALLEY CHURCH TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER ROBERT ANDREW JEAVONS | Chair | 02 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev ROGER ALLEN PERRISS BA DIP ARC | Trustee | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA DAWN CLOWES | Trustee | 02 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.98k | £82.76k | £89.14k | £87.38k | £92.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.33k | £79.55k | £87.36k | £87.46k | £93.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 JUN 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ("THE OBJECTS"): 1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 2)TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; 3) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND 4) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spa View Community Church
40a Spa View Place
Sheffield
S12 4HD
- Phone:
- 01142511048
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window