Accounts and annual returns BROMLEY HEALTHCARE CHARITY

Charity number: 1154305
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 March 2021 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 September 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On Time