BALTIC CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Foundation are to promote general charitable activities for the public benefit, in particular in the fields of the arts and culture, the advancement of education and training, science, ecology and healthcare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 July 2013: CIO registration
- 04 September 2013: Funds received from 328629 THE BALTIC CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WARREN ROITER | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|||||
BRENDA KNOBLE | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
PIERRETTE MADELELINE GODDARD | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GODDARD | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.49k | £75.06k | £110.00k | £270.00k | £25.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.64k | £129.02k | £127.42k | £60.70k | £228.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Jul 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY TO THE APPLICATION OF CIO FUNDS, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR ANY EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 Weymouth Mews
LONDON
W1G 7EH
- Phone:
- 02072922570
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window