BIG WORLD IMPACT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are working with local communities to deliver an enriched programme for young people, aged primarily between 9 and 19 years old. The programme consists of sport/outdoor activities such as football, hockey, touch rugby, archery, sailing and arts/cultural programmes. The range of activities will aid the personal and social development of young people.This will be due to launch in April 2014.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hampshire
Governance
- 12 September 2013: Standard registration
- 21 September 2016: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 21 September 2016: Funds transferred to 1121216 ACTIVE COMMUNITIES NETWORK LIMITED
- BWI (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 01 May 2015 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | 28 May 2015 | 28 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/12/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE POVERTY, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, AND TO RELIEVE NEED IN INDIVIDUALS ARISING FROM THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS AND IN SUCH PLACES IN THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window