ALZHEIMER'S AND DEMENTIA UK TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 October 2013: Standard registration
- 09 November 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- ALZEIMER'S AND DEMENTIA UK TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 16 May 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 16 May 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 16 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 16 May 2014 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 MAY 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES, FRIENDS AND CARERS SUFFERING FROM ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE AND ITS EFFECTS BY:- A) THE PROVISION OF EMOTIONAL AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT, ADVICE, EDUCATION AND INFORMATION AND BY RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE SAID CONDITION AND B) TO MAKE GRANTS BY WAY OF FUNDING TO CHARITIES FOR THE PURPOSES OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMERS DISEASE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window