Trustees CADE PAVILION, ELTISLEY
Charity Number: 1153931

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Herring | Chair | 24 September 2013 |
|
|||||
Darren Stevenson | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Bryan Fordham | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE MacBrayne | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew Howell | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Anne Sills | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARY ROSE FLINDERS | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS FLINDERS | Trustee | 24 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM SILLS | Trustee | 24 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.