Financial history THE NORTH DEVON BIOSPHERE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1156589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £292.95k £372.16k £638.28k £578.91k £868.42k
Total expenditure £142.33k £434.61k £466.62k £505.63k £739.13k
Income from government contracts £122.96k N/A £33.18k N/A £217.41k
Income from government grants N/A £355.00k £605.10k £470.18k £452.09k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £33.18k £52.58k £33.20k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £605.10k £526.33k £835.23k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £466.62k £457.42k £688.32k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £31.76k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £48.21k £50.81k