SWAROVSKI FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Established in 2013, the Swarovski Foundation brings focus to Swarovski's historical commitment to philanthropy by supporting charitable organisations and signature programmes to achieve positive social and environmental impact. Its mission is to promote sustainable livelihoods through education to reduce inequality by supporting initiatives that focus on Equity, Water, and Creativity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£3,838,816
Donations and legacies | £3.84m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,239,427
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.24m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.24m | |
Retained for future use | £599.39k |
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 02 September 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marisa Schiestl-Swarovski | Chair | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maximilian Haim-Swarovski | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Marshall Gawn | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Heinz Georg Albert Fassmann | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Mansson | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anouchka Rafail-Vogiatzakis | Trustee | 11 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ambassador Helene Antonia vonDamm | Trustee | 21 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £957.98k | £1.15m | £1.75m | £2.09m | £3.84m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.45m | £853.22k | £1.61m | £1.63m | £3.24m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £957.98k | £1.15m | £1.75m | £2.09m | £3.84m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.45m | £853.22k | £1.61m | £1.63m | £3.24m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £47.18k | £39.04k | £44.84k | £68.80k | £39.55k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.11m | £448.14k | £905.09k | £954.49k | £1.89m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £547.24k | £514.87k | £596.92k | £1.12m | £2.07m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £993.94k | £653.07k | £587.51k | £657.28k | £988.02k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 NOV 2016 as amended on 09 Feb 2022 as amended on 19 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
1.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE FOR SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND & WALES, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: 1.1.1 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING THROUGHOUT THE WORLD; 1.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF ART, CULTURE AND HERITAGE; 1.1.3 THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; 1.1.4 THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. 1.2 IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE DIRECTORS SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE DIRECTORS ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Building 4 Chiswick Park
566 Chiswick High Road
1st Floor
London
W4 5YE
- Phone:
- 02036408310
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window