Trustees SWAROVSKI FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1153618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marisa Schiestl-Swarovski Chair 01 August 2018
None on record
Maximilian Haim-Swarovski Trustee 27 February 2025
None on record
Ryan Marshall Gawn Trustee 17 May 2024
None on record
Dr Heinz Georg Albert Fassmann Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record
Lynda Mansson Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Anouchka Rafail-Vogiatzakis Trustee 11 February 2022
None on record
Ambassador Helene Antonia vonDamm Trustee 21 November 2016
None on record