Accounts and annual returns ALPHA & OMEGA MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1152736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 October 2024 266 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 February 2023 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 March 2022 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 April 2021 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required