NEW HORIZONS MENTAL HEALTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote mental health and assist people with mental health problems by providing support and information. The charity operates within the area of Cwm Taf Local Health Board, or elsewhere for the benefit of persons who are ordinarily resident in this area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £166,981 from 1 government contract(s) and £1,563 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bridgend
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 29 July 2013: CIO registration
- 01 October 2013: Funds received from 1066601 NEW HORIZONS - MENTAL HEALTH AND EMOTIONAL WELLBEI...
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ieuan Riggs | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marcus John Longley | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karl Lionel Coomansingh | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Gillard | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN MITCHELL | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Jayne Griffiths | Trustee | 11 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Bennett | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £246.81k | £291.36k | £301.71k | £190.95k | £273.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.35k | £184.23k | £263.02k | £264.70k | £254.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £153.02k | £153.92k | £158.59k | £156.08k | £166.98k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.46k | £5.00k | £5.00k | £1.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 29 Jul 2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MENTAL HEALTH AND ASSIST PEOPLE WITH MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND INFORMATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS ORDINARILY RESIDENT WITHIN THE AREA OF CWM TAF LOCAL HEALTH BOARD OR SUCH BOARD OR BOARDS AS MAY REPLACE THE SAME FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16A DEAN Street
DEAN STREET
ABERDARE
MID GLAMORGAN
CF44 7BN
- Phone:
- 01685881113
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window