BULKINGTON NUNEATON BEDWORTH U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our objects are the advancement of education,and in particular the education of middle-aged and older people who are not in full-time gainful employment. (From the constitution of the third age trust)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Coventry City
- Leicestershire
- Staffordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 11 July 2013: Standard registration
- BNB U3A (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Financial Conduct Authority
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Adams | Chair | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Catherine Dowsett | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|||||
David Bell | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Quittenton | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Davis | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.03k | £4.34k | £7.34k | £10.74k | £11.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.04k | £3.02k | £7.74k | £10.29k | £11.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 NOV 2004 as amended on 19 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
Charitable Purposes The charitable purpose of The BNB U3A is: i. The advancement of education, and in particular the education of older people and those who are retired from full-time work, by all means including associated activities conductive to learning and personal development in Bulkington, Nuneaton and Bedworth, and its surrounding locality.
Contact information
- Address:
-
129 Tresillian Road
Exhall
COVENTRY
CV7 9PP
- Phone:
- 07429 368057
- Email:
- PAUL@U3ANUNEATON.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window