MIMBRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mimbre are a female-led producing company, creating acrobatic theatre for outdoor and unusual settings, touring nationally and internationally, with a strong digital presence. We run a vibrant local youth programme, Mimbre Youth, and an artist development programme for physical performers. We collaborate across the Creative Industries, as consultants and creators.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- France
- Germany
- Ireland
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Poland
- Scotland
- Spain
- Sweden
Governance
- 08 August 2013: Standard registration
- MIMBRE LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edouard Mansilla | Trustee | 14 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ANTONIA BYATT | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Irene Butera | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ifunanya Ifeacho | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Wordsworth | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Mai Sims | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £238.10k | £228.18k | £267.16k | £240.57k | £212.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £271.26k | £215.77k | £261.95k | £256.23k | £239.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.84k | £16.05k | £9.65k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/03/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/06/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/06/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF THE ART OF DRAMA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 4
THE ENERGY CENTRE
BOWLING GREEN WALK
LONDON
N1 6AL
- Phone:
- 02076131068
- Email:
- info@mimbre.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window