ATLANTIC RACQUET CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Development and provision of facilities to the local community for the playing of sport, fitness & recreational activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 31 March 2014: Standard registration
- WHTC (Working name)
- ATLANTIC RAQUET CENTRE (Previous name)
- WESTWARD HO! TENNIS CLUB (Previous name)
- WHTC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Northam Care Trust | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neil Darnley | Trustee | 27 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID VINALL | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Atlantic Coast Co-operative Trust | Trustee | 26 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anoushka Lynd FCA CTA | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARK RAMSAY CLAYTON | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.86k | £325.32k | £318.33k | £324.07k | £279.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.31k | £129.38k | £250.21k | £218.05k | £255.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.00k | £48.21k | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 OCT 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/08/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07/01/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/01/2014
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF PARTICIPATION BY THE COMMUNITY OF TORRIDGE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING TENNIS, BADMINTON, SQAUSH, TABLE TENNIS AND OTHER SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES OF BENEFIT TO THAT COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Atlantic Racquet Centre
Farm Road
Caddsdown Industrial Park
BIDEFORD
EX39 3BE
- Phone:
- 07587782675
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window