Home Education Wales

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING RESOURCES, AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR FAMILIES TO MEET TO DEVELOP SUPPORT NETWORKS AND ENABLE SKILL SHARING; PROVIDING THE OPPORTUNITY FOR CHILDREN TO MEET, DEVELOP SOCIAL NETWORKS, FRIENDSHIPS AND A PEER GROUP; ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND ARTS ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF DEVELOPING THE SKILLS OF FAMILIES ENABLING THEM TO PARTICIPATE AS FULLY AS POSSIBLE IN SOCIETY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 01 October 2013: CIO registration
- 31 March 2015: Funds received from 1138591 NEW FOUNDATIONS H.E.
- NFHE (Working name)
- NEW FOUNDATIONS HOME EDUCATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rhianyeth Logue | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Donna Helyer Rapley | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Palmer | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.00k | £4.09k | £861 | £17.75k | £20.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.12k | £3.75k | £1.43k | £15.03k | £20.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 209 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 01 Oct 2013 as amended on 09 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF HOME EDUCATED CHILDREN OR CHILDREN WHO FIND IT DIFFICULT TO ENGAGE WITH MAINSTREAM EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, RESOURCES, FACILITIES, SUPPORT AND INFORMATION FOR BOTH THEM AND THEIR PARENTS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1. PROVIDING RESOURCES, SUPPORT AND INFORMATION FOR HOME EDUCATORS AND THEIR FAMILIES; 2. PROVIDING THE OPPORTUNITY FOR PARENTS, GUARDIANS AND CARERS TO MEET IN ORDER TO DEVELOP A MUTUAL SUPPORT NETWORK AND ENABLE SHARING OF SKILLS, EXPERIENCE AND KNOWLEDGE WITHIN THE GROUP; 3. PROVIDING THE OPPORTUNITY FOR CHILDREN TO MEET IN ORDER TO DEVELOP SOCIAL NETWORKS, FRIENDSHIPS AND A PEER GROUP; 4. ASSISTING PARENTS, GUARDIANS AND CARERS WHO ELECT TO HOME EDUCATE IN MEETING THE SPECIFIC EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN AND PROVIDE A SUITABLE AND APPROPRIATE EDUCATION; 5. PROMOTING GROUP WORKING AMONGST CHILDREN WHO ARE HOME EDUCATED; 6. ORGANISING PROGRAMS OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES INCLUDING THE ARTS AS A MEANS OF DEVELOPING THE SKILLS OF THE FAMILIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE AS FULLY AS POSSIBLE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 Highmead Road
CARDIFF
CF5 4GX
- Phone:
- 07913955583
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window