DATAKIND (UK) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DataKind UK believes data can have a transformative effect on how charities make decisions and create social change. It can be difficult for charities to fund analytic posts. Meanwhile, many data scientists want to help make the world a better place. We provide data scientists with a way to volunteer their skills on charity projects and show charities the power of their data.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 October 2013: Standard registration
- DATAKIND UK (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tariq Khokhar | Chair | 16 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Lauren Woodman | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey MacDonald | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Vang | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bethia McNeil | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Ed Anderton | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £248.11k | £391.26k | £378.81k | £369.92k | £322.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.25k | £277.35k | £331.55k | £427.80k | £386.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02/10/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY CHARITABLE AND NON CHARITABLE BODIES BY IMPROVING ACCESS TO AND USE OF DATA AND ANALYTICAL TECHNIQUES TO ASSIST THEM IN FURTHERING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
DataKind UK
7 Bell Yard
London
WC2A 2JR
- Phone:
- 07974271311
- Email:
- contact@datakind.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window