JUBILEE - LEAMINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. The advancement of the Christian religion in the United Kingdom and overseas in accordance with the statement of faith produced by the Evangelical Alliance 2. The advancement for the public benefit of religious and other education 3. To relieve people who are in charitable 4 Such other charitable purposes as the Directors/Trustees in their absolute discretion think fit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 06 August 2013: Standard registration
- 13 November 2014: Funds received from 1112073 THE JUBILEE CHURCH TRUST LEAMINGTON SPA
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Catto | Trustee | 28 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP DOWLING | Trustee | 28 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Dowling | Trustee | 28 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
KIM ROBIN MCCAFFERY | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER FORBES CATTO | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.42k | £103.28k | £82.12k | £83.82k | £60.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.60k | £114.44k | £100.66k | £84.16k | £64.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 JUL 2013
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRODUCED BY THE EVANGELICAL ALLIANCE 2 THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF RELIGIOUS AND OTHER EDUCATION 3 TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WHO ARE IN CHARITABLE NEED BECAUSE OF: A SICKNESS OR POOR HEALTH B AGE C FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR D SOME OTHER REASON BY ANY PROPER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT AND INCLUDING (WHERE APPROPRIATE BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE; THE PROMOTION OF GOOD PRACTICES TO COMBAT SUCH CONDITIONS AND THE PROVISION OF RESOURCES TO ALLEVIATE OR PREVENT NEED 4 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 JOURDAIN PARK
HEATHCOTE
WARWICK
CV34 6FJ
- Phone:
- 01926459777
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window